Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Legal Aid

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633 /CH0674 (SB0396/CH0675)
Title
Higher Education - Legal Representation Fund for Title IX Proceedings - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0665 (SB0811)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827 /CH0559 (SB0688)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect – Sex Trafficking – Services and Investigations (Child Sex Trafficking Screening and Services Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1189 /CH0282 (SB0425/CH0283)
Title
Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 /CH0270
Title
Membership - Department of Juvenile Services State Advisory Board
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0396 /CH0675 (HB0633/CH0674)
Title
Higher Education - Legal Representation Fund for Title IX Proceedings - Established
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0425 /CH0283 (HB1189/CH0282)
Title
Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation - End-of-Life Legal Services Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0688 (HB0827/CH0559)
Title
Juvenile Law – Sex Trafficking – Immunity, Services, and Investigations (Child Sex Trafficking Screening and Services Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0748
Title
Criminal Procedure - Conditional Release
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811 (HB0665)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0962
Title
Correctional Services - Offender Rehabilitation and Reentry Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1017
Title
Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0633 /CH0674 (SB0396/CH0675) Higher Education - Legal Representation Fund for Title IX Proceedings - Established Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 674
Appropriations
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0665 (SB0811) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0827 /CH0559 (SB0688) Child Abuse and Neglect – Sex Trafficking – Services and Investigations (Child Sex Trafficking Screening and Services Act of 2019) Delegate Lierman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1189 /CH0282 (SB0425/CH0283) Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Economic Matters
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0072 /CH0270 Membership - Department of Juvenile Services State Advisory Board Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0396 /CH0675 (HB0633/CH0674) Higher Education - Legal Representation Fund for Title IX Proceedings - Established Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 675
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0425 /CH0283 (HB1189/CH0282) Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0658 Maryland Legal Services Corporation - End-of-Life Legal Services Pilot Program Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0688 (HB0827/CH0559) Juvenile Law – Sex Trafficking – Immunity, Services, and Investigations (Child Sex Trafficking Screening and Services Act of 2019) Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0748 Criminal Procedure - Conditional Release Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0811 (HB0665) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0962 Correctional Services - Offender Rehabilitation and Reentry Program - Establishment Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB1017 Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM