Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Legislation -see also- Correct Leg; Cur Leg; Emerg Bills

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0044 (SB0091)
Title
Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246
Title
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Environmental Impact Statements
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0247 (SB0445)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Surgical Birth Rate - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0277 /CH0605 (SB0249/CH0606)
Title
Regional Initiative to Limit or Reduce Greenhouse Gas Emissions in Transportation Sector - Authorization (Regional Transportation and Climate Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0533 /CH0346 (SB0719/CH0345)
Title
University System of Maryland - Board of Regents - Transparency and Oversight
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 /CH0553 (SB0930)
Title
Workgroup to Study Shelter and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1016
Title
General Assembly - Analysis of Proposed Legislation - Racial Impact
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1108
Title
State Budget
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1208
Title
Board of Restorative Practices in Schools - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 (HB0044)
Title
Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0249 /CH0606 (HB0277/CH0605)
Title
Regional Initiative to Limit or Reduce Greenhouse Gas Emissions in Transportation Sector - Authorization (Regional Transportation and Climate Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392
Title
Legislation - Employee Organizations - Certification of Differential Impact
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0414
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0445 (HB0247)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Surgical Birth Rate - Study
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0512 /CH0522 (HB1318)
Title
Government Shutdowns - Employees - Protections
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0719 /CH0345 (HB0533/CH0346)
Title
University System of Maryland - Board of Regents - Transparency and Oversight
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0793 /CH0025 (HB1094)
Title
Community Safety and Strengthening Act
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0044 (SB0091) Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0246 General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Environmental Impact Statements Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0247 (SB0445) Maryland Health Care Commission - Surgical Birth Rate - Study Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0277 /CH0605 (SB0249/CH0606) Regional Initiative to Limit or Reduce Greenhouse Gas Emissions in Transportation Sector - Authorization (Regional Transportation and Climate Protection Act of 2019) Delegate Korman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 605
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0533 /CH0346 (SB0719/CH0345) University System of Maryland - Board of Regents - Transparency and Oversight Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0911 /CH0553 (SB0930) Workgroup to Study Shelter and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Minors Delegate Krimm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1016 General Assembly - Analysis of Proposed Legislation - Racial Impact Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB1108 State Budget Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1208 Board of Restorative Practices in Schools - Establishment Delegate Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0091 (HB0044) Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0249 /CH0606 (HB0277/CH0605) Regional Initiative to Limit or Reduce Greenhouse Gas Emissions in Transportation Sector - Authorization (Regional Transportation and Climate Protection Act of 2019) Senator Lam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 606
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Economic Matters
SB0392 Legislation - Employee Organizations - Certification of Differential Impact Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0414 Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0445 (HB0247) Maryland Health Care Commission - Surgical Birth Rate - Study Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0512 /CH0522 (HB1318) Government Shutdowns - Employees - Protections Senator Ellis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Economic Matters
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0719 /CH0345 (HB0533/CH0346) University System of Maryland - Board of Regents - Transparency and Oversight Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0793 /CH0025 (HB1094) Community Safety and Strengthening Act Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM