Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Libraries -see also- Archives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0258 (SB0780)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Elizabeth Seton High School Library Renovation
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0542 /CH0479 (SB0264/CH0478)
Title
Circuit Court for Calvert County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0783 (SB0309)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Early Literacy Center
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1153
Title
State Highway Administration - Signs Along State Highways - Public Libraries
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155 (SB0906/CH0206)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264 /CH0478 (HB0542/CH0479)
Title
Circuit Court for Calvert County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0309 (HB0783)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Early Literacy Center
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's County
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360 /CH0162
Title
Calvert County - Budget Hearings and Procedures
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493
Title
Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Annotated Code of Maryland
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0780 (HB0258)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Elizabeth Seton High School Library Renovation
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Nonprofit Organizations Authorized to Perform Auxiliary Library Services
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0906 /CH0206 (HB1155)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0258 (SB0780) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Elizabeth Seton High School Library Renovation Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0542 /CH0479 (SB0264/CH0478) Circuit Court for Calvert County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 479
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0783 (SB0309) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Early Literacy Center Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1153 State Highway Administration - Signs Along State Highways - Public Libraries Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1155 (SB0906/CH0206) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0264 /CH0478 (HB0542/CH0479) Circuit Court for Calvert County - Fees for Appearance of Counsel Senator Miller 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 478
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0309 (HB0783) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Early Literacy Center Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 10:00 AM
SB0354 Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's County Senator Hershey 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0360 /CH0162 Calvert County - Budget Hearings and Procedures Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0493 Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Annotated Code of Maryland Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0780 (HB0258) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Elizabeth Seton High School Library Renovation Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 3:00 PM
SB0789 Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Nonprofit Organizations Authorized to Perform Auxiliary Library Services Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0906 /CH0206 (HB1155) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM