Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

License Plates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0061
Title
Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0062
Title
Vehicle Laws - Displaying Front Registration Plate - Exemption for Class L (Historic) and Class N (Street Rod) Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0201 /CH0076
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical Therapists
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0313 /CH0157 (SB0298/CH0156)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0417
Title
Public Safety - Police Profiling - "Right-to-Carry" Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524 /CH0257
Title
Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate - Class L (Historic) Vehicles and Class N (Street Rod) Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1203
Title
Motor Vehicles - Registration - Class S (Drivers' School) Vehicle
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1241 /CH0122
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls and Related Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0124
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical Therapists
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0298 /CH0156 (HB0313/CH0157)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0304
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Class L (Historic) Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0380
Title
Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate - Class L (Historic) Vehicles and Class N (Street Rod) Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0061 Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0062 Vehicle Laws - Displaying Front Registration Plate - Exemption for Class L (Historic) and Class N (Street Rod) Vehicles Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0201 /CH0076 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical Therapists Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0313 /CH0157 (SB0298/CH0156) Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0417 Public Safety - Police Profiling - "Right-to-Carry" Permit Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0524 /CH0257 Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate - Class L (Historic) Vehicles and Class N (Street Rod) Vehicles Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1203 Motor Vehicles - Registration - Class S (Drivers' School) Vehicle Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1241 /CH0122 Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls and Related Fees Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0124 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Parking Placards for Individuals With Disabilities - Licensed Physical Therapists Senator Gladden 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0298 /CH0156 (HB0313/CH0157) Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Financing or Leasing Agreements Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 156
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0304 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Class L (Historic) Vehicles Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0380 Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate - Class L (Historic) Vehicles and Class N (Street Rod) Vehicles Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM