Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

License Plates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0294
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Fees - Refunds on Surrender of Registration Card and Plates
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1011
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - Thin Blue Line
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1265
Title
Vehicle Registration - Special Plates for Honorably Discharged Veterans
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039 /CH0041
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Disability Parking Placards
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0294 Vehicle Laws - Registration Fees - Refunds on Surrender of Registration Card and Plates Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1011 Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - Thin Blue Line Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1265 Vehicle Registration - Special Plates for Honorably Discharged Veterans Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0039 /CH0041 Motor Vehicle Administration - Disability Parking Placards Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM