Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Lieutenant Governor

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0400
Title
State Government - Use of Public Resources - Reimbursement by Elected Officials
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0485 /CH0312 (SB0593)
Title
Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing Fund - Income Tax Checkoff
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0573 (SB0518)
Title
Fair Elections Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0775 /CH0275
Title
Inaugural Committees - Donations and Disbursements - Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064
Title
Election Law - Audits of Election Results
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0165
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Constitutional Officers - Forfeiture of Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0518 (HB0573)
Title
Fair Elections Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0400 State Government - Use of Public Resources - Reimbursement by Elected Officials Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0485 /CH0312 (SB0593) Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing Fund - Income Tax Checkoff Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0573 (SB0518) Fair Elections Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0775 /CH0275 Inaugural Committees - Donations and Disbursements - Disclosure Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1064 Election Law - Audits of Election Results Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0165 State Retirement and Pension System - Constitutional Officers - Forfeiture of Benefits Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2015 - 8:30 AM
SB0518 (HB0573) Fair Elections Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM