Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Limited Liability Companies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0308
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Licenses MC 20-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0363 /CH0064 (SB0111/CH0063)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744 /CH0674 (SB0481)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 (SB0382/CH0280)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1062
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Professional Engineers and Professional Land Surveyors - Revisions and Repeal of Firm Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1638
Title
Employee Ownership Trusts
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0111 /CH0063 (HB0363/CH0064)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382 /CH0280 (HB0991)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite Organizations
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0481 (HB0744/CH0674)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656 (HB0714)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1086
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency and Registered Voter Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0308 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Licenses MC 20-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0363 /CH0064 (SB0111/CH0063) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0744 /CH0674 (SB0481) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0991 (SB0382/CH0280) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite Organizations Delegate Lierman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1062 Business Occupations and Professions - Professional Engineers and Professional Land Surveyors - Revisions and Repeal of Firm Permits Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1184 Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1638 Employee Ownership Trusts Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0111 /CH0063 (HB0363/CH0064) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company Senator McFadden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Budget and Taxation
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0382 /CH0280 (HB0991) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite Organizations Senator McFadden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Finance
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
SB0481 (HB0744/CH0674) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0656 (HB0714) Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - Repeal Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1086 Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency and Registered Voter Requirements Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (128-3)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM