Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Litter

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580)
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0259 /CH0599 (SB0394/CH0600)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Boating Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0921 (SB1036)
Title
Environment - Conowingo Dam - Water Quality Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155 /CH0160
Title
Prince George’s County – Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items – Penalties PG 418–19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0394 /CH0600 (HB0259/CH0599)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Boating Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1036 (HB0921)
Title
Environment - Conowingo Dam - Water Quality Certification
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580) Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0259 /CH0599 (SB0394/CH0600) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Boating Offenses Delegate Moon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 599
Judiciary
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0921 (SB1036) Environment - Conowingo Dam - Water Quality Certification Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1155 /CH0160 Prince George’s County – Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items – Penalties PG 418–19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Environment and Transportation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0394 /CH0600 (HB0259/CH0599) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Boating Offenses Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 600
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1036 (HB0921) Environment - Conowingo Dam - Water Quality Certification Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM