Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Long-Term Care -see also- Continuing Care; Nursing Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0100 /CH0381
Title
Dental Hygienists - Practice in Long-Term Care Facilities - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0271 (SB0276)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331)
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0637 (SB0537)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Rare and Expensive Case Management Program - Waiver Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0778
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0846
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Viatical Settlement Contracts - Long-Term Care Services
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0906
Title
Medical Laboratories - Direct-to-Consumer Genetic Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267 /CH0353 (SB0882/CH0352)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check Program
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013
Title
Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program Advisory Committee
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 (HB0295/CH0262)
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0478
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0537 (HB0637)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Rare and Expensive Case Management Program - Waiver Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0721
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Down Syndrome (Micah's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0882 /CH0352 (HB1267/CH0353)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0100 /CH0381 Dental Hygienists - Practice in Long-Term Care Facilities - Repeal of Termination Date Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Health and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0271 (SB0276) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331) Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0637 (SB0537) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Rare and Expensive Case Management Program - Waiver Amendment Delegate Hubbard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0778 Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums Delegate Hubbard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0846 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Viatical Settlement Contracts - Long-Term Care Services Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB0906 Medical Laboratories - Direct-to-Consumer Genetic Testing Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB1267 /CH0353 (SB0882/CH0352) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1511 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check Program Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2014 - 12:30 PM
SB0013 Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program Advisory Committee Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
1/09/2014 - 1:30 PM
SB0331 (HB0295/CH0262) Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0478 Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0537 (HB0637) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Rare and Expensive Case Management Program - Waiver Amendment Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0721 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Down Syndrome (Micah's Law) Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0882 /CH0352 (HB1267/CH0353) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder Workgroup Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM