Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Long-Term Care -see also- Continuing Care; Nursing Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0822 (SB0006)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196 (SB0832)
Title
Commission on the Long-Term Care Medical Assistance Program Eligibility Determination Process
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 (HB0822)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0297 /CH0155
Title
Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 /CH0363
Title
Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0795
Title
Health Care Facilities - Cost of Residents' Care - Determination and Payment of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0832 (HB1196)
Title
Commission on the Long-Term Care Medical Assistance Program Eligibility Determination Process
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0822 (SB0006) Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1196 (SB0832) Commission on the Long-Term Care Medical Assistance Program Eligibility Determination Process Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0006 (HB0822) Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0297 /CH0155 Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0556 /CH0363 Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal Law Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0795 Health Care Facilities - Cost of Residents' Care - Determination and Payment of Funds Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0832 (HB1196) Commission on the Long-Term Care Medical Assistance Program Eligibility Determination Process Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM