Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Long-Term Care -see also- Continuing Care; Nursing Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132 /CH0208
Title
Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program - Regulations
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0493 /CH0672
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 (SB0644)
Title
Dental Hygienist - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentist
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 (SB0419)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Stella Maris Transitional Care Center
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0953 /CH0213 (SB0696/CH0212)
Title
Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1233 (SB0984)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release Program
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1599 (SB1109)
Title
Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1647
Title
Nursing Homes - Lifting of Immobile Patients - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0176
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Moratorium on Renewal Premium Rate Increases
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0240
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - Report
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0419 (HB0794)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Stella Maris Transitional Care Center
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0644 (HB0727)
Title
Dental Hygienist - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentist
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671 /CH0202 (HB0752/CH0203)
Title
Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0696 /CH0212 (HB0953/CH0213)
Title
Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0984 (HB1233)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release Program
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1064
Title
Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - St. Mary's Nursing Center
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1109 (HB1599)
Title
Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1199
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Sale or Transfer of Book of Business
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0132 /CH0208 Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program - Regulations Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0493 /CH0672 Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rates Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 672
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0727 (SB0644) Dental Hygienist - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentist Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0794 (SB0419) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Stella Maris Transitional Care Center Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 10:00 AM
HB0953 /CH0213 (SB0696/CH0212) Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1233 (SB0984) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release Program Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1599 (SB1109) Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1647 Nursing Homes - Lifting of Immobile Patients - Requirements Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0176 Long-Term Care Insurance - Moratorium on Renewal Premium Rate Increases Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0240 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - Report Senator Robinson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0419 (HB0794) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Stella Maris Transitional Care Center Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0432 Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0644 (HB0727) Dental Hygienist - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentist Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0671 /CH0202 (HB0752/CH0203) Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0696 /CH0212 (HB0953/CH0213) Task Force on Long-Term Care Education and Planning Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0984 (HB1233) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Enhanced Security Compassionate Release Program Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB1064 Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - St. Mary's Nursing Center Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB1109 (HB1599) Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1199 Long-Term Care Insurance - Sale or Transfer of Book of Business Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM