Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Long-Term Care -see also- Continuing Care; Nursing Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0609
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0738 /CH0399
Title
Dental Hygienist – Scope of Practice – Practice Settings Under General Supervision
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0832 (SB0699/CH0414)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Prohibition on Denial
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836 (SB0650)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009 (SB0700)
Title
Home- and Community-Based Services Waivers - Alterations (Laurie's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064
Title
Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1388 (SB0415/CH0463)
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Annual Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0046 /CH0107
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon Lapse - Application
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0415 /CH0463 (HB1388)
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Annual Notice
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0474
Title
Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rate Increases - Restriction (Equity in Long-Term Care Insurance Premiums Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0650 (HB0836)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0699 /CH0414 (HB0832)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Prohibition on Denial
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0700 (HB1009)
Title
Home- and Community-Based Services Waivers - Alterations (Laurie's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0609 Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0738 /CH0399 Dental Hygienist – Scope of Practice – Practice Settings Under General Supervision Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0832 (SB0699/CH0414) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Prohibition on Denial Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2019 - 2:00 PM
Rules
HB0836 (SB0650) Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1009 (SB0700) Home- and Community-Based Services Waivers - Alterations (Laurie's Law) Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB1064 Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1388 (SB0415/CH0463) Long-Term Care Insurance - Annual Notice Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
Finance
SB0046 /CH0107 Long-Term Care Insurance - Contingent Benefit Upon Lapse - Application Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Finance
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0415 /CH0463 (HB1388) Long-Term Care Insurance - Annual Notice Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
Finance
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0474 Long-Term Care Insurance - Premium Rate Increases - Restriction (Equity in Long-Term Care Insurance Premiums Act) Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0650 (HB0836) Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0699 /CH0414 (HB0832) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Prohibition on Denial Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Finance
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0700 (HB1009) Home- and Community-Based Services Waivers - Alterations (Laurie's Law) Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Motion to refer to Budget and Taxation (Senator King) Adopted
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM