Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0579 (SB0351)
Title
Workgroup to Study Prize-Linked Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685 /CH0280 (SB0421/CH0281)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Enforcement and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0739 (SB0470)
Title
Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0802
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Adjustment to the Distribution of Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0963
Title
Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0987
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Operator Compliance - Disclosure of Winning Odds on Video Lottery Terminals
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1015 (SB0326)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1132
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Sports Wagering Operations
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1326
Title
State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Distribution to Local Boards of Education
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1397
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Eastern Shore Veterans' Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0326 (HB1015)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0351 (HB0579)
Title
Workgroup to Study Prize-Linked Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0421 /CH0281 (HB0685/CH0280)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Enforcement and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0470 (HB0739)
Title
Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0988
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0579 (SB0351) Workgroup to Study Prize-Linked Savings Accounts Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0685 /CH0280 (SB0421/CH0281) Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Enforcement and Reporting Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Ways and Means
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0739 (SB0470) Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0802 State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Adjustment to the Distribution of Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Repeal Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0963 Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0987 Gaming - Video Lottery Operator Compliance - Disclosure of Winning Odds on Video Lottery Terminals Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1015 (SB0326) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1132 State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Sports Wagering Operations Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1326 State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Distribution to Local Boards of Education Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1397 State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Eastern Shore Veterans' Organizations Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0326 (HB1015) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0351 (HB0579) Workgroup to Study Prize-Linked Savings Accounts Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0421 /CH0281 (HB0685/CH0280) Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Enforcement and Reporting Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2019 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0470 (HB0739) Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0988 Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal Senator King 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM