Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Managed Care Organizations -see also- Health Maint Orgs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 (SB0497)
Title
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0798 /CH0121
Title
Health Insurance - Reporting Requirements - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1318 /CH0309 (SB0929)
Title
Health Benefit Plans - Network Access Standards and Provider Network Directories
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1347
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Managed Care Organizations - Disenrollment
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385 /CH0510
Title
Public Health - Advance Directives - Procedures, Information Sheet, and Use of Electronic Advance Directives
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0497 (HB0595)
Title
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662
Title
Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0929 (HB1318/CH0309)
Title
Health Benefit Plans - Network Access Standards and Provider Network Directories
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0595 (SB0497) Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0798 /CH0121 Health Insurance - Reporting Requirements - Repeal Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1318 /CH0309 (SB0929) Health Benefit Plans - Network Access Standards and Provider Network Directories Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1347 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Managed Care Organizations - Disenrollment Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 /CH0510 Public Health - Advance Directives - Procedures, Information Sheet, and Use of Electronic Advance Directives Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0497 (HB0595) Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open Act Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-1)
Finance
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0662 Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0929 (HB1318/CH0309) Health Benefit Plans - Network Access Standards and Provider Network Directories Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM