Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mandatory Retirement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0164 /CH0248 (SB0176/CH0249)
Title
Judges' Retirement System - Mandatory Retirement Age - Clarification of Eligibility for Allowance
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0176 /CH0249 (HB0164/CH0248)
Title
Judges' Retirement System - Mandatory Retirement Age - Clarification of Eligibility for Allowance
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0164 /CH0248 (SB0176/CH0249) Judges' Retirement System - Mandatory Retirement Age - Clarification of Eligibility for Allowance Delegate Barnes, B. 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Appropriations
2/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 AM
SB0176 /CH0249 (HB0164/CH0248) Judges' Retirement System - Mandatory Retirement Age - Clarification of Eligibility for Allowance Senator Guzzone 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2018 - 9:30 AM
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM