Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Manslaughter

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0324
Title
Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0454 (SB0490/CH0497)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0748 (SB0533)
Title
Criminal Law – Homicide – Unborn Child (Laura and Reid’s Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0490 /CH0497 (HB0454)
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0533 (HB0748)
Title
Criminal Law – Homicide – Unborn Child (Laura and Reid’s Law)
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0324 Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0454 (SB0490/CH0497) Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information Delegate Moon 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0748 (SB0533) Criminal Law – Homicide – Unborn Child (Laura and Reid’s Law) Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0490 /CH0497 (HB0454) Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0533 (HB0748) Criminal Law – Homicide – Unborn Child (Laura and Reid’s Law) Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM