Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Maps and Charts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0743 /CH0537 (SB0604/CH0536)
Title
Income Tax Forms - Graphical Representation of General Fund Expenditures
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Hogan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213
Title
Maryland Congressional Redistricting Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1327 (SB0582)
Title
Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed Districts
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0394
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Refund Program
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0582 (HB1327)
Title
Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed Districts
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0604 /CH0536 (HB0743/CH0537)
Title
Income Tax Forms - Graphical Representation of General Fund Expenditures
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0743 /CH0537 (SB0604/CH0536) Income Tax Forms - Graphical Representation of General Fund Expenditures Delegate Clagett 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0970 General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission Delegate Hogan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1213 Maryland Congressional Redistricting Commission Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1327 (SB0582) Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed Districts Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0394 Statewide Container Recycling Refund Program Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0582 (HB1327) Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed Districts Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0604 /CH0536 (HB0743/CH0537) Income Tax Forms - Graphical Representation of General Fund Expenditures Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM