Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Marriage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0033
Title
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Conduct (Lynette's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236 (SB0208)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0448 (SB0769)
Title
Income Tax - Elimination of the Marriage Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0542 (SB0017)
Title
Family Law - Performance of Marriage Ceremonies
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0548 (SB0672)
Title
Condominium Boards of Directors - Membership - Prohibition on Married Couples
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0570 (SB0621)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse - Augmented Estate
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1042 (SB0648/CH0322)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of Death
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1444 (SB1037)
Title
Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery Organization
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0017 (HB0542)
Title
Family Law - Performance of Marriage Ceremonies
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208 (HB0236)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0621 (HB0570)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse - Augmented Estate
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0648 /CH0322 (HB1042)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of Death
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 (HB0548)
Title
Condominium Boards of Directors - Membership - Prohibition on Married Couples
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0769 (HB0448)
Title
Income Tax - Elimination of the Marriage Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1037 (HB1444)
Title
Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery Organization
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0033 Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Conduct (Lynette's Law) Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2014 - 3:30 PM
HB0236 (SB0208) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0448 (SB0769) Income Tax - Elimination of the Marriage Penalty Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0542 (SB0017) Family Law - Performance of Marriage Ceremonies Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0548 (SB0672) Condominium Boards of Directors - Membership - Prohibition on Married Couples Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0570 (SB0621) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse - Augmented Estate Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1042 (SB0648/CH0322) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of Death Delegate Anderson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1444 (SB1037) Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery Organization Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0017 (HB0542) Family Law - Performance of Marriage Ceremonies Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0208 (HB0236) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0621 (HB0570) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse - Augmented Estate Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0648 /CH0322 (HB1042) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of Death Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0672 (HB0548) Condominium Boards of Directors - Membership - Prohibition on Married Couples Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0769 (HB0448) Income Tax - Elimination of the Marriage Penalty Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1037 (HB1444) Allegany County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution to Cumberland Historic Cemetery Organization Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM