Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Marriage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220 (SB0273)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0281
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564 /CH0435
Title
State Personnel - Limits on Use of Leave for Birth, Adoption, Foster Placement, or Care of Child
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0838 /CH0483 (SB0416/CH0482)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0908 (SB0617)
Title
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1201 (SB0830)
Title
Health Occupations - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Provisional Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 (HB0220)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0416 /CH0482 (HB0838/CH0483)
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0617 (HB0908)
Title
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0830 (HB1201)
Title
Health Occupations - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Provisional Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0220 (SB0273) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0281 Estates and Trusts - Elective Share Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0564 /CH0435 State Personnel - Limits on Use of Leave for Birth, Adoption, Foster Placement, or Care of Child Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Appropriations
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0838 /CH0483 (SB0416/CH0482) Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services Delegate Hill 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0908 (SB0617) Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law) Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1201 (SB0830) Health Occupations - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Provisional Licenses Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0273 (HB0220) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0416 /CH0482 (HB0838/CH0483) Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 482
Finance
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0617 (HB0908) Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law) Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0749 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Prohibitions Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0830 (HB1201) Health Occupations - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Provisional Licenses Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM