Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Marriage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0191 (SB0670)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 /CH0756 (SB0552/CH0757)
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276 (SB0881)
Title
Criminal Law – Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1277
Title
Income Tax - Elimination of the Marriage Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1304
Title
Family Law – Minors – Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1727
Title
Health Insurance - Infertility Treatment and In Vitro Fertilization - Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1824
Title
Prince George's County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution of Proceeds PG 433-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0292 /CH0551
Title
Estates - Administration Exemption - Transfer of Motor Vehicle and Boat Titles
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 /CH0757 (HB0742/CH0756)
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670 (HB0191)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB1276)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0191 (SB0670) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0742 /CH0756 (SB0552/CH0757) State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 756
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1276 (SB0881) Criminal Law – Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1277 Income Tax - Elimination of the Marriage Penalty Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1304 Family Law – Minors – Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1727 Health Insurance - Infertility Treatment and In Vitro Fertilization - Coverage Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1824 Prince George's County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution of Proceeds PG 433-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0292 /CH0551 Estates - Administration Exemption - Transfer of Motor Vehicle and Boat Titles Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0552 /CH0757 (HB0742/CH0756) State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 757
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0670 (HB0191) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 (HB1276) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM