Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Marriage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218 /CH0232 (SB0147/CH0231)
Title
Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0424 /CH0121 (SB0141/CH0122)
Title
Washington County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519 /CH0438 (SB0697/CH0437)
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855 (SB0231)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0871 /CH0021 (SB0690/CH0022)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0964
Title
Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian Consent
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147
Title
Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1181
Title
Family Investment Program - Couples Advancing Together Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1198 /CH0373
Title
Human Trafficking – Required Posting
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 /CH0122 (HB0424/CH0121)
Title
Washington County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0147 /CH0231 (HB0218/CH0232)
Title
Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0231 (HB0855)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0690 /CH0022 (HB0871/CH0021)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 /CH0437 (HB0519/CH0438)
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0218 /CH0232 (SB0147/CH0231) Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2019 - 2:00 PM
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0424 /CH0121 (SB0141/CH0122) Washington County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee Delegate Corderman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0519 /CH0438 (SB0697/CH0437) Family Law - Parentage and Adoption Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0855 (SB0231) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0871 /CH0021 (SB0690/CH0022) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Delegate Pippy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 21
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0964 Public Health - Abortions Sought by Minors - Parent or Guardian Consent Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1147 Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1181 Family Investment Program - Couples Advancing Together Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1198 /CH0373 Human Trafficking – Required Posting Delegate Cox 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0141 /CH0122 (HB0424/CH0121) Washington County - Disposition of Marriage Ceremony Fee Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0147 /CH0231 (HB0218/CH0232) Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0231 (HB0855) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0690 /CH0022 (HB0871/CH0021) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0697 /CH0437 (HB0519/CH0438) Family Law - Parentage and Adoption Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM