Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1132 /CH0074 (SB0749/CH0073)
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operational Changes
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0568
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Motorist Benefits - Procedural Requirements for Filing Claims
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749 /CH0073 (HB1132/CH0074)
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operational Changes
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891
Title
Courts - Service of Process - Driver of Motor Vehicle or Driver's Estate
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0930 /CH0334
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Premium Payments - Acceptance on Installment Payment Basis and Premium Finance Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1132 /CH0074 (SB0749/CH0073) Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operational Changes Delegate Rudolph 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0568 Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Motorist Benefits - Procedural Requirements for Filing Claims Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0749 /CH0073 (HB1132/CH0074) Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operational Changes Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0891 Courts - Service of Process - Driver of Motor Vehicle or Driver's Estate Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0930 /CH0334 Property and Casualty Insurance - Premium Payments - Acceptance on Installment Payment Basis and Premium Finance Agreements Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM
Click to return on the top page