Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0987
Title
Vehicle Laws - Security Lapses - Notice to Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1045 (SB0743/CH0852)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161 /CH0195 (SB0856/CH0196)
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1514
Title
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 /CH0852 (HB1045)
Title
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0856 /CH0196 (HB1161/CH0195)
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1265 /CH0030
Title
Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0987 Vehicle Laws - Security Lapses - Notice to Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1045 (SB0743/CH0852) Motor Vehicle Insurance – Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1161 /CH0195 (SB0856/CH0196) Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Economic Matters
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1514 Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0743 /CH0852 (HB1045) Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs Senator Middleton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852
Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0856 /CH0196 (HB1161/CH0195) Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1265 /CH0030 Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018 Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM