Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 /CH0164
Title
Property Tax Credits – Maryland–National Capital Park and Planning Commission Park Police Officers and Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission Police Officers MC/PG 108–19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362 /CH0562
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Duty of Fair Representation MC/PG 109-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662 /CH0165
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Glenn Dale Hospital Property MC/PG 110-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0678 /CH0166
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County Recreation Programs - Youth Sports Program and Division MC/PG 115-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1157 /CH0353
Title
Prince George's County - Workgroup on Alcohol Outlet Density Zones PG 303-19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220
Title
Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1279 /CH0354
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Procurement - Source Selection MC/PG 112-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0352 /CH0164 Property Tax Credits – Maryland–National Capital Park and Planning Commission Park Police Officers and Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission Police Officers MC/PG 108–19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Ways and Means
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0362 /CH0562 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative Duty of Fair Representation MC/PG 109-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0662 /CH0165 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Glenn Dale Hospital Property MC/PG 110-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0678 /CH0166 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County Recreation Programs - Youth Sports Program and Division MC/PG 115-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1157 /CH0353 Prince George's County - Workgroup on Alcohol Outlet Density Zones PG 303-19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1220 Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV Areas Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1279 /CH0354 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Procurement - Source Selection MC/PG 112-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM