Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Maryland Register

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0016 (SB0261)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 /CH0005 (SB0538)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0605
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0736 (SB0928)
Title
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1191 (SB0623)
Title
Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1204 (SB0683)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0261 (HB0016)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538 (HB0560/CH0005)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0623 (HB1191)
Title
Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683 (HB1204)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0928 (HB0736)
Title
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty Drugs
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0016 (SB0261) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Delegate Arora 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0560 /CH0005 (SB0538) Public-Private Partnerships Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0605 Public-Private Partnerships Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
Appropriations
HB0736 (SB0928) Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty Drugs Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1191 (SB0623) Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2013 - 12:00 PM
HB1204 (SB0683) Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0261 (HB0016) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0538 (HB0560/CH0005) Public-Private Partnerships President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0623 (HB1191) Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0683 (HB1204) Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0928 (HB0736) Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty Drugs Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM