Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Massage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0208 /CH0229
Title
State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners - Preapproval for Use of Trade Names - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0587 /CH0262
Title
State Board of Barbers - Limited License - Barber-Stylist
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0979 (SB0580)
Title
State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners and State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Dry Needling - Registration Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580 (HB0979)
Title
State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners and State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Dry Needling - Registration Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0208 /CH0229 State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners - Preapproval for Use of Trade Names - Repeal Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0587 /CH0262 State Board of Barbers - Limited License - Barber-Stylist Delegate Davis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0979 (SB0580) State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners and State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Dry Needling - Registration Requirements Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0580 (HB0979) State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners and State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Dry Needling - Registration Requirements Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM