Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mass Transit -see also- Buses; Railroads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0300 /CH0238
Title
Department of Transportation - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Services - Utilization Study
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546
Title
Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning Board
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866
Title
Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Law Enforcement and Public Transportation - One-Party Consent for Interception of Oral Communications
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1049
Title
Voter Registration Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1127
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1198 (SB0882/CH0130)
Title
Baltimore City Civilian Review Board
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0800
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0882 /CH0130 (HB1198)
Title
Baltimore City Civilian Review Board
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0104 Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB0300 /CH0238 Department of Transportation - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Services - Utilization Study Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0546 Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning Board Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0866 Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Law Enforcement and Public Transportation - One-Party Consent for Interception of Oral Communications Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1049 Voter Registration Act of 2015 Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1127 Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State Employees Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1198 (SB0882/CH0130) Baltimore City Civilian Review Board Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0800 Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0882 /CH0130 (HB1198) Baltimore City Civilian Review Board Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM