Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Meat, Poultry, Seafood -see also- Clams; Crabs; Oysters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0905 (SB0725)
Title
Chesapeake Bay - Nutrient Management - Poultry Fair Share Act
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity and Enforcement Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0938
Title
Health - General - Poultry Processed in the People's Republic of China - Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1076 (SB0521)
Title
Energy-Generating Cooperative Advisory Committee
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1153 /CH0642 (SB0929)
Title
Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1256 (SB0011/CH0118)
Title
Food Processing Plants - License Fees - Civic and Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1392
Title
Maryland Wholesome Meat Act - Prohibitions - Equines and Equine Meat
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0011 /CH0118 (HB1256)
Title
Food Processing Plants - License Fees - Civic and Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127 /CH0036
Title
Department of Agriculture - Manure Transportation Project
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0521 (HB1076)
Title
Poultry Litter Energy-Generating Cooperative Program
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 (HB0905)
Title
Chesapeake Bay - Nutrient Management - Poultry Fair Share Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0929 (HB1153/CH0642)
Title
Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0905 (SB0725) Chesapeake Bay - Nutrient Management - Poultry Fair Share Act Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0913 Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity and Enforcement Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0938 Health - General - Poultry Processed in the People's Republic of China - Notice Requirements Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1076 (SB0521) Energy-Generating Cooperative Advisory Committee Delegate Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1153 /CH0642 (SB0929) Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642
Environmental Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1256 (SB0011/CH0118) Food Processing Plants - License Fees - Civic and Nonprofit Organizations Delegate Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1392 Maryland Wholesome Meat Act - Prohibitions - Equines and Equine Meat Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0011 /CH0118 (HB1256) Food Processing Plants - License Fees - Civic and Nonprofit Organizations Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Finance
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0127 /CH0036 Department of Agriculture - Manure Transportation Project Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0521 (HB1076) Poultry Litter Energy-Generating Cooperative Program Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
SB0725 (HB0905) Chesapeake Bay - Nutrient Management - Poultry Fair Share Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0929 (HB1153/CH0642) Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM