Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Medical Malpractice

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1029 (SB0783)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114 (SB0836)
Title
Health Care Malpractice - Awards and Judgments - Periodic Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1265 (SB0835)
Title
Patient Safety Early Intervention Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1296 /CH0597 (SB0981/CH0596)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Quasi-Judicial Powers and the Board of Review - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1310 (SB0834)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1313 /CH0583
Title
State Board of Physicians - Consultation, Qualification for Licensure, License Renewal, and Representation to the Public
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1316 (SB0771)
Title
Postjudgment Interest - Medical Injury
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 (HB1316)
Title
Postjudgment Interest - Medical Injury
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783 (HB1029)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0834 (HB1310)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 (HB1265)
Title
Patient Safety Early Intervention Programs
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836 (HB1114)
Title
Health Care Malpractice - Awards and Judgments - Periodic Payments
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0981 /CH0596 (HB1296/CH0597)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Quasi-Judicial Powers and the Board of Review - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1029 (SB0783) State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1114 (SB0836) Health Care Malpractice - Awards and Judgments - Periodic Payments Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1265 (SB0835) Patient Safety Early Intervention Programs Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1296 /CH0597 (SB0981/CH0596) State Board of Physicians - Quasi-Judicial Powers and the Board of Review - Revisions Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1310 (SB0834) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1313 /CH0583 State Board of Physicians - Consultation, Qualification for Licensure, License Renewal, and Representation to the Public Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1316 (SB0771) Postjudgment Interest - Medical Injury Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0771 (HB1316) Postjudgment Interest - Medical Injury Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0783 (HB1029) State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0834 (HB1310) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0835 (HB1265) Patient Safety Early Intervention Programs Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0836 (HB1114) Health Care Malpractice - Awards and Judgments - Periodic Payments Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0981 /CH0596 (HB1296/CH0597) State Board of Physicians - Quasi-Judicial Powers and the Board of Review - Revisions Senator Montgomery 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM