Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Medical Malpractice

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0909 (SB0862)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1581 (SB0030)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert – Limitation on Testimony in Personal Injury Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1726
Title
Maryland Dentistry Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0030 (HB1581)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Limitation on Testimony in Personal Injury Claims - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0862 (HB0909)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0909 (SB0862) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1581 (SB0030) Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert – Limitation on Testimony in Personal Injury Claims Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1726 Maryland Dentistry Act - Revisions Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0030 (HB1581) Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Limitation on Testimony in Personal Injury Claims - Repeal Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Failed (41-89)
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0862 (HB0909) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM