Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Medical Research

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 /CH0419
Title
Health - Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0443
Title
Crimes Relating to Animals - Unauthorized Use of Dogs and Cats in Research Facilities - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490 /CH0251
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0567
Title
Crimes Relating to Animals - Failure to Offer Dogs and Cats Used in Research Facilities for Adoption - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0531)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1057
Title
Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 (HB0911)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0431 /CH0419 Health - Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties Delegate Parrott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0443 Crimes Relating to Animals - Unauthorized Use of Dogs and Cats in Research Facilities - Penalties Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
HB0490 /CH0251 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Miscellaneous Revisions Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0567 Crimes Relating to Animals - Failure to Offer Dogs and Cats Used in Research Facilities for Adoption - Penalties Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
HB0911 (SB0531) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1057 Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - Prohibition Delegate Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0531 (HB0911) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM