Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Medical Research

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0056 (SB0063)
Title
Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346 (SB1037)
Title
Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0587 (SB0661)
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0594
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0699 (SB0700)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 (SB0665)
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0798 /CH0121
Title
Health Insurance - Reporting Requirements - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1267
Title
Poly-Morphone-Assisted Treatment Pilot Program - Harm Reduction Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385 /CH0510
Title
Public Health - Advance Directives - Procedures, Information Sheet, and Use of Electronic Advance Directives
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1422 (SB0739)
Title
Integrated Community Oncology Reporting Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1580
Title
Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0063 (HB0056)
Title
Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0661 (HB0587)
Title
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0665 (HB0782)
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0739 (HB1422)
Title
Integrated Community Oncology Reporting Program
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1037 (HB0346)
Title
Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0056 (SB0063) Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0346 (SB1037) Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - Prohibition Delegate Carter 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0587 (SB0661) Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0594 Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2016 Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0699 (SB0700) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0782 (SB0665) Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Economic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0798 /CH0121 Health Insurance - Reporting Requirements - Repeal Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1267 Poly-Morphone-Assisted Treatment Pilot Program - Harm Reduction Act of 2016 Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 /CH0510 Public Health - Advance Directives - Procedures, Information Sheet, and Use of Electronic Advance Directives Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1422 (SB0739) Integrated Community Oncology Reporting Program Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1580 Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0063 (HB0056) Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0661 (HB0587) Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0665 (HB0782) Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0739 (HB1422) Integrated Community Oncology Reporting Program Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1037 (HB0346) Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - Prohibition Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM