Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Medical Research

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373 /CH0475 (SB0226/CH0476)
Title
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Qualified Maryland Biotechnology Company - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 (SB0420)
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0584 /CH0771 (SB0572)
Title
Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1053
Title
Integrated Community Oncology Reporting Program
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 (SB0400)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372
Title
Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1429 (SB0788)
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Medical Cannabis Grower Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0226 /CH0476 (HB0373/CH0475)
Title
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Qualified Maryland Biotechnology Company - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0400 (HB1172)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0420 (HB0528)
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0572 (HB0584/CH0771)
Title
Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0788 (HB1429)
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Medical Cannabis Grower Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0373 /CH0475 (SB0226/CH0476) Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Qualified Maryland Biotechnology Company - Definition Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0528 (SB0420) Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2017 Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0584 /CH0771 (SB0572) Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act Delegate Young, K. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 771
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1053 Integrated Community Oncology Reporting Program Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1172 (SB0400) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 PM
Finance
HB1372 Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Pilot Program Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1429 (SB0788) Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Medical Cannabis Grower Licenses Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0226 /CH0476 (HB0373/CH0475) Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Qualified Maryland Biotechnology Company - Definition Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0400 (HB1172) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0420 (HB0528) Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2017 Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0572 (HB0584/CH0771) Investigational Drugs, Biological Products, and Devices - Right to Try Act Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - House Refuses to Recede
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0788 (HB1429) Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Medical Cannabis Grower Licenses Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM