Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Medical Schools

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373 (SB0151/CH0193)
Title
Hospitals - Outpatient Services - Off-Site Facility - Rate Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0893 (SB0759)
Title
State Personnel - Equality for Maryland Caregivers Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1100
Title
Maryland Compassionate Care Act
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1101 /CH0403
Title
Medical Marijuana - Academic Medical Centers - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1313 /CH0583
Title
State Board of Physicians - Consultation, Qualification for Licensure, License Renewal, and Representation to the Public
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0151 /CH0193 (HB0373)
Title
Hospitals - Outpatient Services - Off-Site Facility - Rate Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0759 (HB0893)
Title
State Personnel - Equality for Maryland Caregivers Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0373 (SB0151/CH0193) Hospitals - Outpatient Services - Off-Site Facility - Rate Regulation Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0893 (SB0759) State Personnel - Equality for Maryland Caregivers Act of 2013 Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1100 Maryland Compassionate Care Act Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1101 /CH0403 Medical Marijuana - Academic Medical Centers - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1313 /CH0583 State Board of Physicians - Consultation, Qualification for Licensure, License Renewal, and Representation to the Public Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0151 /CH0193 (HB0373) Hospitals - Outpatient Services - Off-Site Facility - Rate Regulation Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Finance
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0759 (HB0893) State Personnel - Equality for Maryland Caregivers Act of 2013 Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM