Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mentors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0163 /CH0164 (SB0129/CH0163)
Title
Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Submission of a Comprehensive Master Plan - Repeal of Duplicative Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0509
Title
Green Career Gender Empowerment and Training Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 /CH0300
Title
Education - Community School Strategy - Required Notice and Support
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1403 /CH0033 (SB1170)
Title
Next Generation Scholars of Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1410 (SB0493/CH0740)
Title
Teacher Induction, Retention, and Advancement Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0129 /CH0163 (HB0163/CH0164)
Title
Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Submission of a Comprehensive Master Plan - Repeal of Duplicative Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493 /CH0740 (HB1410)
Title
Teacher Induction, Retention, and Advancement Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1170 (HB1403/CH0033)
Title
Next Generation Scholars of Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0163 /CH0164 (SB0129/CH0163) Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Submission of a Comprehensive Master Plan - Repeal of Duplicative Requirement Delegate Anderson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0509 Green Career Gender Empowerment and Training Pilot Program Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 /CH0300 Education - Community School Strategy - Required Notice and Support Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1403 /CH0033 (SB1170) Next Generation Scholars of Maryland Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 33
Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1410 (SB0493/CH0740) Teacher Induction, Retention, and Advancement Act of 2016 Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0129 /CH0163 (HB0163/CH0164) Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Submission of a Comprehensive Master Plan - Repeal of Duplicative Requirement Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0493 /CH0740 (HB1410) Teacher Induction, Retention, and Advancement Act of 2016 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 740
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1170 (HB1403/CH0033) Next Generation Scholars of Maryland Senator Conway 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM