Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mergers and Acquisitions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1566 /CH0219 (SB0854/CH0220)
Title
Public Utilities - Water and Sewage Disposal Companies - Acquisition
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0041 /CH0100
Title
Nonstock Corporations – Consolidations, Mergers, and Conversions
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854 /CH0220 (HB1566/CH0219)
Title
Public Utilities – Water and Sewage Disposal Companies – Acquisition
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0865 (HB1095)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1566 /CH0219 (SB0854/CH0220) Public Utilities - Water and Sewage Disposal Companies - Acquisition Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Economic Matters
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0041 /CH0100 Nonstock Corporations – Consolidations, Mergers, and Conversions Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0854 /CH0220 (HB1566/CH0219) Public Utilities – Water and Sewage Disposal Companies – Acquisition Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0865 (HB1095) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM