Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Mobile Devices -see also- Telecommunications and IT

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0225
Title
Gaming - Sports Wagering - Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0249
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Opt Out of Third-Party Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0272
Title
Juveniles – Sexting
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0499 /CH0222 (SB0246/CH0223)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557 /CH0252 (SB0607/CH0253)
Title
Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784 (SB0957)
Title
Consumer Protection - Online Privacy - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Money Transmissions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0888 (SB0443)
Title
Consumer Protection - Security Features for Connected Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940
Title
Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957 (SB1005)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Net Neutrality Act of 2020
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 (SB0851/CH0586)
Title
Human Services - Department of Disabilities - Accessibility Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1124 (SB0723)
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Repair
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1518
Title
Opioid-Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids - Mobile Application - Pilot Program (I'm Alive Today App)
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1656
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Privacy and Data Collection
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 /CH0492
Title
Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering Referendum and Minority Business Enterprise Disparity Study
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0246 /CH0223 (HB0499/CH0222)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443 (HB0888)
Title
Consumer Protection - Security Features for Connected Devices
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0607 /CH0253 (HB0557/CH0252)
Title
Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0723 (HB1124)
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Repair
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851 /CH0586 (HB1003)
Title
Human Services – Department of Disabilities – Accessibility Programs
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0957 (HB0784)
Title
Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 (HB0957)
Title
Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0225 Gaming - Sports Wagering - Implementation Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0249 Consumer Protection - Right to Opt Out of Third-Party Disclosure Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0272 Juveniles – Sexting Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0499 /CH0222 (SB0246/CH0223) Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Delegate Moon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 222
Judiciary
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0557 /CH0252 (SB0607/CH0253) Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access Delegate Attar 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 252
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0784 (SB0957) Consumer Protection - Online Privacy - Study Delegate Carey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
3/09/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0855 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Money Transmissions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0888 (SB0443) Consumer Protection - Security Features for Connected Devices Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0940 Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0957 (SB1005) Commercial Law - Maryland Net Neutrality Act of 2020 Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1003 (SB0851/CH0586) Human Services - Department of Disabilities - Accessibility Programs Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1124 (SB0723) Consumer Protection - Right to Repair Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1400 Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1518 Opioid-Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids - Mobile Application - Pilot Program (I'm Alive Today App) Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1656 Commercial Law - Consumer Privacy and Data Collection Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0004 /CH0492 Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering Referendum and Minority Business Enterprise Disparity Study Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 492
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0246 /CH0223 (HB0499/CH0222) Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Senator Sydnor 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 223
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0443 (HB0888) Consumer Protection - Security Features for Connected Devices Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0607 /CH0253 (HB0557/CH0252) Motor Scooter and Electric Low Speed Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access Senator Benson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 253
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0723 (HB1124) Consumer Protection - Right to Repair Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0754 Financial Institutions - Consumer Protection - Money Transmissions and Virtual Currencies Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0851 /CH0586 (HB1003) Human Services – Department of Disabilities – Accessibility Programs Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0957 (HB0784) Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 (HB0957) Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 2:06 PM