Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mobile and Manufactured Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0163 /CH0287 (SB0162/CH0286)
Title
St. Mary's County - Mobile Home Parks - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0020
Title
Wicomico County - Vehicle Dealer's Licenses - Motor Home and Travel Trailer Shows
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0162 /CH0286 (HB0163/CH0287)
Title
St. Mary's County - Mobile Home Parks - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005
Title
Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Rent Increases
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0163 /CH0287 (SB0162/CH0286) St. Mary's County - Mobile Home Parks - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0020 Wicomico County - Vehicle Dealer's Licenses - Motor Home and Travel Trailer Shows Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0162 /CH0286 (HB0163/CH0287) St. Mary's County - Mobile Home Parks - Repeal Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Rent Increases Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM