Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Monuments and Memorials

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0120 (SB0177)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - The Jane Hanson National Memorial
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1131 /CH0570 (SB0857/CH0569)
Title
Commission on the Establishment of a Maryland Educators Service Memorial
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247
Title
State Government - Frederick Douglass and Harriet Tubman Memorial Statues - Placement and Commission
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0177 (HB0120)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - The Jane Hanson National Memorial
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Len Bias Statue at Northwestern High School
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0857 /CH0569 (HB1131/CH0570)
Title
Commission on the Establishment of a Maryland Educators Service Memorial
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940
Title
Baltimore County and Carroll County - Authority to Place Boundary Monuments
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0120 (SB0177) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - The Jane Hanson National Memorial Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB1131 /CH0570 (SB0857/CH0569) Commission on the Establishment of a Maryland Educators Service Memorial Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570
Ways and Means
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1247 State Government - Frederick Douglass and Harriet Tubman Memorial Statues - Placement and Commission Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0177 (HB0120) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - The Jane Hanson National Memorial Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0851 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Len Bias Statue at Northwestern High School Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0857 /CH0569 (HB1131/CH0570) Commission on the Establishment of a Maryland Educators Service Memorial Senator Miller 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 569
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0940 Baltimore County and Carroll County - Authority to Place Boundary Monuments Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM