Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mopeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0250 /CH0392
Title
Vehicle Laws - Definition of "Bicycle" - Mopeds
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540
Title
Motor Vehicles - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Titling for Nonresidents
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120 (SB0387)
Title
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378 /CH0294
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387 (HB1120)
Title
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0205 Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0250 /CH0392 Vehicle Laws - Definition of "Bicycle" - Mopeds Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0540 Motor Vehicles - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Titling for Nonresidents Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1120 (SB0387) Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0378 /CH0294 Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0387 (HB1120) Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM