Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Morticians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106 /CH0602 (SB0439/CH0603)
Title
Health Occupations - Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprenticeships
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1179
Title
Public Health - Unborn Human Beings and Infants (Humane Disposition of Human Remains Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023 /CH0501
Title
Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 /CH0603 (HB0106/CH0602)
Title
Health Occupations - Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprenticeships
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0106 /CH0602 (SB0439/CH0603) Health Occupations - Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprenticeships Delegate Krebs 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 602
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1179 Public Health - Unborn Human Beings and Infants (Humane Disposition of Human Remains Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0023 /CH0501 Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0084 Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2020 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0439 /CH0603 (HB0106/CH0602) Health Occupations - Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprenticeships Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 603
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/29/2020 5:30 PM