Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Motion Pictures

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Minority Business Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0753 (SB0905/CH0486)
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB0813)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Niarchos Parkway Film Center
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 (HB1139)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Niarchos Parkway Film Center
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0905 /CH0486 (HB0753)
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0401 Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Minority Business Reporting Requirement Delegate Howard, C. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0753 (SB0905/CH0486) Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 (SB0813) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Niarchos Parkway Film Center Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 9:00 AM
SB0813 (HB1139) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Niarchos Parkway Film Center Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 11:00 AM
SB0905 /CH0486 (HB0753) Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 486
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
4/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM
Click to return on the top page