Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motion Pictures

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0892 /CH0429 (SB0795/CH0428)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Movie Theater License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1206
Title
Baltimore County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Classes and Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1320 /CH0587 (SB0877/CH0586)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater) License
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0795 /CH0428 (HB0892/CH0429)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Movie Theater License
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 /CH0586 (HB1320/CH0587)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater) License
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0892 /CH0429 (SB0795/CH0428) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Movie Theater License Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1206 Baltimore County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Classes and Rates Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1320 /CH0587 (SB0877/CH0586) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater) License Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 587
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0795 /CH0428 (HB0892/CH0429) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Movie Theater License Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0877 /CH0586 (HB1320/CH0587) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater) License Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 586
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM