Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0013
Title
Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Indication of Applicant's Sex
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Medical Services - Motorcycle Response Unit
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0142
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0293
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Protective Headgear
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1091 (SB1030)
Title
Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099 (SB0868)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1586 /CH0088 (SB0355/CH0087)
Title
Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355 /CH0087 (HB1586/CH0088)
Title
Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439
Title
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0606 /CH0700
Title
Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Excise Titling Tax - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail Fund
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 (HB1099)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1030 (HB1091)
Title
Off–Highway Recreational Vehicle Fund – Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0013 Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Indication of Applicant's Sex Delegate Robinson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0060 Vehicle Laws - Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device - Definition Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0139 Public Safety - Emergency Medical Services - Motorcycle Response Unit Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0142 Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0293 Vehicle Laws - Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Protective Headgear Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1091 (SB1030) Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Fund - Establishment Delegate Folden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2018 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1099 (SB0868) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1586 /CH0088 (SB0355/CH0087) Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales Delegate Anderton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0355 /CH0087 (HB1586/CH0088) Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0439 Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0606 /CH0700 Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Excise Titling Tax - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail Fund Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 700
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0868 (HB1099) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1030 (HB1091) Off–Highway Recreational Vehicle Fund – Establishment Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM