Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885
Title
Vehicle Laws - Equipment - Prohibition on Counterfeit Airbags and Substandard Airbags
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1110
Title
Consumer Protection - Sales of Tires - Limitations and Required Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB0886)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1179 (SB0472)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer Decals
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116
Title
Commercial Law - Cancellation of Sales of Motor Vehicles and Internet Sales
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0249
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Retaliation Against Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0472 (HB1179)
Title
Worcester County - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer Decals
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0886 (HB1139)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0885 Vehicle Laws - Equipment - Prohibition on Counterfeit Airbags and Substandard Airbags Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1110 Consumer Protection - Sales of Tires - Limitations and Required Notice Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 (SB0886) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with Dealers Delegate Frush 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1179 (SB0472) Vehicle Laws - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer Decals Delegate Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0116 Commercial Law - Cancellation of Sales of Motor Vehicles and Internet Sales Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0249 Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Retaliation Against Dealers Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Failed (20-25)
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0472 (HB1179) Worcester County - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer Decals Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0886 (HB1139) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with Dealers Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM