Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1104 /CH0517
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Consumer Data Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1586 /CH0088 (SB0355/CH0087)
Title
Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355 /CH0087 (HB1586/CH0088)
Title
Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1031
Title
Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Consumer Data Protection
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1104 /CH0517 Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Consumer Data Protection Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1586 /CH0088 (SB0355/CH0087) Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales Delegate Anderton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0355 /CH0087 (HB1586/CH0088) Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1031 Vehicle Laws – Manufacturers and Dealers – Consumer Data Protection Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM