Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Inspection

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246 /CH0091 (SB0389)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0677
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Request for Exhaust Emissions Test After Failing On-Board Diagnostics Test
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1160 (SB0919)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1227
Title
Law Enforcement Procedures - Traffic Stops and Safety Checkpoints
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 /CH0003
Title
Vehicle Laws - Preventive Maintenance Program - Preventive Maintenance Technician
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0014
Title
Vehicle Laws - Commercial and Farm Vehicles - Safety Inspections and Utility Emergencies
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389 (HB0246/CH0091)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 (HB0666)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 (HB1160)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0246 /CH0091 (SB0389) Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - Procedures Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Environmental Matters
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0677 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Request for Exhaust Emissions Test After Failing On-Board Diagnostics Test Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1160 (SB0919) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1227 Law Enforcement Procedures - Traffic Stops and Safety Checkpoints Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0006 /CH0003 Vehicle Laws - Preventive Maintenance Program - Preventive Maintenance Technician Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 /CH0014 Vehicle Laws - Commercial and Farm Vehicles - Safety Inspections and Utility Emergencies Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0389 (HB0246/CH0091) Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - Procedures Senator Robey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 (HB0666) Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0919 (HB1160) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Establishment Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM