Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Inspection

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0917 /CH0287 (SB0716)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231 (SB0868/CH0204)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0716 (HB0917/CH0287)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 /CH0204 (HB1231)
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0917 /CH0287 (SB0716) Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1231 (SB0868/CH0204) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 9:45 a.m.
Economic Matters
4/13/2015 - 9:45 AM
SB0716 (HB0917/CH0287) Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0868 /CH0204 (HB1231) Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services and For-Hire Transportation Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Finance
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM