Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Motor Vehicle Inspection

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Deployed Military Personnel - Exemption
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0154
Title
Motor Vehicles – Electronic Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0158
Title
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1148
Title
Vehicle Laws - Military Surplus Vehicles - Registration and Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1215
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions - Vehicles With Low Annual Mileage
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258
Title
Historic Motor Vehicles - Exemption From Emissions Inspections - Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1505
Title
Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1543 (SB0912)
Title
Environment – Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1626
Title
Zero-Emission Motor Vehicles - Registration Fees (Increasing Highway Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Renewal - Inspection Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0874 (HB1483)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912 (HB1543)
Title
Environment - Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0133 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Deployed Military Personnel - Exemption Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0154 Motor Vehicles – Electronic Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0158 Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections - Standards and Requirements Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1148 Vehicle Laws - Military Surplus Vehicles - Registration and Operation Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1215 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions - Vehicles With Low Annual Mileage Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1258 Historic Motor Vehicles - Exemption From Emissions Inspections - Limitation Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1505 Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1543 (SB0912) Environment – Climate Crisis and Education Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Economic Matters
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1626 Zero-Emission Motor Vehicles - Registration Fees (Increasing Highway Equity Act) Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0566 Vehicle Laws - Registration Renewal - Inspection Requirement Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0874 (HB1483) Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0912 (HB1543) Environment - Climate Crisis and Education Act Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/17/2020 2:25 PM