Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Motor Vehicle Insurance -see also- MD Auto Insurance Fund

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0473
Title
Baltimore City - Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Notice and Use of Consumer Report
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0945)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Occupation or Education Level
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0657 (SB1059)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Marital Status or Gender
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 (SB0551)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0987
Title
Vehicle Laws - Security Lapses - Notice to Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1045 (SB0743/CH0852)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161 /CH0195 (SB0856/CH0196)
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1514
Title
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1670 (SB0072)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1759
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 (HB1670)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0453 /CH0192
Title
Insurance Article - References to Vehicles and Automobiles - Consistency
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0551 (HB0749)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0573
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 /CH0852 (HB1045)
Title
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0856 /CH0196 (HB1161/CH0195)
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0945 (HB0656)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Occupation or Education Level
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1059 (HB0657)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Marital Status or Gender
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1131 /CH0624
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Commercial Policies - Insurance Identification Card
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0473 Baltimore City - Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Notice and Use of Consumer Report Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0656 (SB0945) Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Occupation or Education Level Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0657 (SB1059) Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Marital Status or Gender Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0749 (SB0551) Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0987 Vehicle Laws - Security Lapses - Notice to Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1045 (SB0743/CH0852) Motor Vehicle Insurance – Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1161 /CH0195 (SB0856/CH0196) Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Economic Matters
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1514 Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1670 (SB0072) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1759 Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0072 (HB1670) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:15 p.m.
Finance
1/23/2018 - 2:15 PM
SB0453 /CH0192 Insurance Article - References to Vehicles and Automobiles - Consistency Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Finance
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0551 (HB0749) Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0573 Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0743 /CH0852 (HB1045) Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs Senator Middleton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852
Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0856 /CH0196 (HB1161/CH0195) Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0945 (HB0656) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating - Use of Occupation or Education Level Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1059 (HB0657) Motor Vehicle Insurance – Discrimination in Underwriting and Rating – Use of Marital Status or Gender Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1131 /CH0624 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Commercial Policies - Insurance Identification Card Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM